IL HB2475 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the earned income tax credit to (i) 12% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2017 and beginning prior to January 1, 2018, (ii) 14% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2018 and beginning prior to January 1, 2019, (iii) 16% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2019 and beginning prior to January 1, 2020, (iv) 18% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2020 and beginning prior to January 1, 2021, and (v) 20% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EARNED INCOME CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2475&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2475.htm |