IL HB2475 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the earned income tax credit to (i) 12% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2017 and beginning prior to January 1, 2018, (ii) 14% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2018 and beginning prior to January 1, 2019, (iii) 16% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2019 and beginning prior to January 1, 2020, (iv) 18% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2020 and beginning prior to January 1, 2021, and (v) 20% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-EARNED INCOME CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355212Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback