IL HB2471 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Breakfast and Lunch Program Act. In provisions concerning reimbursement of sponsors, provides that the State Board of Education shall reimburse not less than $0.15 or the actual cost, whichever is less, to non-profit welfare centers for each free breakfast and lunch. Provides that the State Board of Education shall establish the Healthy School Meals for All Program to begin on July 1, 2023. Provides that each school board of a school district or governing body of a nonpublic school that chooses to participate in the Healthy School Meals for All Program shall offer eligible meals, without charge, to all students enrolled in schools that participate in the National School Breakfast Program and National School Lunch Program. Sets forth provisions regarding eligibility for the Healthy School Meals for All Program, program requirements, reimbursement (subject to appropriation), federal and other funding, State Board support and technical assistance, and the federal Local Food for Schools Cooperative Agreement Program. Provides that if the United States Department of Agriculture creates the option for the State, as a whole, to participate in the Community Eligibility Provision, then the State Board of Education shall evaluate whether that option is anticipated to require less State funding than the Healthy School Meals for All Program and provide at least as many free meals to students. Sets forth requirements concerning that option. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH BREAKFAST/LUNCH-SUPP AID
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 88 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0532 |
2023-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2023 |
2023-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | House | House Concurs |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 088-024-000 |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-05-09 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-09 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Education |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-026-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |