IL HB2464 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Removes the limitation that physicians may not supervise more than 2 physician assistants. Provides that the supervising physician must file a notice of supervision with the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation for each physician assistant under his or her supervision. Provides that the physician's supervision shall be continuous, but does not necessarily require the physical presence of the supervising physician at the time and place that the services are rendered by the physician assistant. Provides that it is the obligation of the supervising physician to ensure that the physician assistant's scope of practice is identified; that the medical tasks delegated to the physician assistant are appropriate to the physician assistant's level of competence; that the working relationship between the supervising physician and physician assistant is defined, including the means and frequency of access to the supervising physician; and that a process for evaluation of the physician assistant's performance is established. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Removes the limitation that physicians may not enter into supervising physician agreements with more than 2 physician assistants.
Title
PHYS ASSISTANT PRACT-SUPERVISI
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2464&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2464.htm |