IL HB2457 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to provide support services to every child in its care. Provides that "support services" refers to an individually designed set of services and supports provided to children and their families that includes treatment services, personal support services, or any other supports necessary to foster education preparedness, employability, and preservation of the child in the family home. Requires support services to be developed through a collaborative approach between the Department, the child, if aged 14 years or older, the child's parent or guardian, other service providers or State agencies that work with children or youth, schools, extended family and friends, and any other persons that the child or family identifies as integral to the child's social, mental, or emotional development. Requires the Department to determine by rule the specific types of support services available to children and families served by the Department, including, but not limited to, medical services, mental health services, substance abuse services, job training and career education services, and self-sufficiency planning. Amends the Programs of the Department of Juvenile Justice Article of the Unified Code of Corrections to add substantially similar requirements for the Department of Juvenile Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-JUV JUST-SUPPORT SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055fNew CodeSee Bill Text
73053-9-8New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback