IL HB2455 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that, for purposes of the Act, "public body" includes judicial bodies of the State. Exempts preliminary drafts, notes, recommendations, memoranda and other records in which opinions are expressed, or policies or actions are formulated, that pertain to the preparation of judicial opinions and orders. Exempts judicial records already subject to fees imposed under the Clerks of Courts Act.
Title
FOIA-JUDICIAL RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2455&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2455.htm |