IL HB2444 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Deletes language providing that at the initial bail hearing or any subsequent hearing, the defendant shall be released on recognizance if the judge finds that the defendant's pre-trial detention will harm any infant or child in the defendant's custody at the time of arrest, unless the harm is outweighed by a clear and serious risk of harm to a victim or the community. Provides circumstances that the court shall consider in favor of release. Removes a factor in mitigation. Makes other changes.
Title
PARENTAL DETENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0471 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-015-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-028-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-5.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |