IL HB2433 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. In provisions concerning the Long-Term Care Facility Advisory Board, adds one member representing local health departments who is a nonvoting member. In provisions concerning complaints for violations of the Act or a rule, provides that the Department of Public Health's annual review and report concerning the complaint process must include substantiated complaints that were completed in a specified time frame. Requires the report to be provided to the General Assembly (in addition to the Long-Term Care Facility Advisory Board and the Illinois Long-Term Care Council). Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING HOMES-COMPLAINTS
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0432 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-003-002 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |