IL HB2433 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $14,189,699 to the Department of Natural Resources from the Abandoned Mined Lands Reclamation Council Federal Trust Fund for grants and contracts to conduct research, planning, and construction to eliminate hazards created by abandoned mines, and any other expenses necessary for emergency response. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DNR-ABANDONED MINE TRUST FUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback