IL HB2431 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act and the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires hospitals to require an intern, resident, or physician who provides medical services at the hospital to have proper credentials and any required certificates for ongoing training at the time the intern, resident, or physician renews his or her license. Amends the Hospital Report Card Act. Requires hospitals to include in their quarterly reports the number of female patients who have died within the reporting period, the number of female patients who have died of a preventable cause within the reporting period and the number of those preventable deaths that the hospital has otherwise reported within the reporting period, and the number of physicians who were required by the hospital to undergo any amount or type of retraining during the reporting period.
Title
HOSPITALS-FEMALE DEATHS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-002-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 10.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 86 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2431&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2431.htm |