IL HB2424 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Transportation to provide higher education student loan repayment assistance in the form of an annual after-tax bonus of $15,000 per year, for not more than 5 years, to any engineer employed by the Department if (i) the engineer is a graduate of a college or university located in this State, (ii) the engineer provides documentation to the Department of the repayment of higher education student loans taken to attend a college or university located in this State, and (iii) the engineer remains in the employ of the Department for at least 5 years. Provides that if the engineer leaves the employ of the Department prior to serving 5 years, the engineer must return all bonuses made to the engineer by the Department pursuant to these provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-BONUS FOR STUDENT LOANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | To Violence Reduction & Prevention Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2424&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2424.htm |