IL HB2422 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10,000,000, or so much of that amount as may be necessary, from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to deposit into the Workforce, Technology, and Economic Development Fund for the purpose of making a grant to the Illinois Manufacturers’ Association for all costs and expenses associated with the Employer Training Investment Program. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$EMPLOYER TRAINING INVESTMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Matt Hanson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2422&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB2422.pdf |