IL HB2412 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits sexual assault by deception if the person commits an act of sexual penetration and the person submits under the belief that the person committing the act is someone known to the victim other than the accused, and this belief is induced by pretense or concealment by the accused with the intent to induce that belief. Sexual assault by deception is a Class 3 felony.
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT BY DECEPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-000-000 |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2412&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2412.htm |