IL HB2410 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that a person may take deer with a .45 caliber or larger air-powered gun. Defines "air-powered gun" as any implement, designed as a gun that will expel a BB or pellet by spring, gas, or air charged from an external high compression power source.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEER HUNTING-AIR GUNS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback