IL HB2409 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Provides that 12.5% of all moneys and the sale proceeds of all other property forfeited and seized under the Acts shall be distributed to the Office of the Public Defender of the county in which the prosecution resulting in the forfeiture was instituted, deposited in a special fund in the county treasury and appropriated to the Public Defender to be used for the expenses incurred in defending persons charged with violating laws governing cannabis and controlled substances. Decreases from 65% to 52.5% the amounts distributed to the metropolitan enforcement group, local, municipal, county, or state law enforcement agency or agencies which conducted or participated in the investigation resulting in the forfeiture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRUG ASSET FORFEITURE-PUB DEF

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-04HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72055012Amended CodeCitation Text
720570505Amended CodeCitation Text
72064685Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback