IL HB2401 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning waivers of School Code mandates.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0151 |
2011-07-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000 |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 022-000-000 |
2011-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.25g | Amended Code | Citation Text |