IL HB2396 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. Increases the number of appointed members to the Real Estate Appraisal Administration and Disciplinary Board who shall have been actively engaged and currently licensed as a State certified general real estate appraiser for a period of not less than 5 years from 4 to 6. Removes 2 members who hold valid licenses as real estate brokers in addition to real estate appraiser licenses. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE APPRAISER BOARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseTo Business Licenses Subcommittee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22545825-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback