IL HB2394 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois and the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, a student who meets the requirements concerning being deemed an Illinois resident for tuition purposes is eligible to apply or receive consideration for any student aid or benefit funded or administered by the State, State agencies, public institutions, or the university, including scholarships, grants, awards, stipends, room and board, tuition waivers, or other financial or in-kind assistance, but excluding Monetary Award Program grants. Prohibits each university and the Illinois Student Assistance Commission from denying a scholarship, grant, or loan to a person who has been convicted of illegal possession or sale of cannabis, controlled substances, or methamphetamine if he or she otherwise qualifies for the scholarship, grant, or loan.
Title
HIGHER ED-IN-STATE STUDENT AID
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 40 N: 57 NV: 19 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 040-057-003 |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-11-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-005-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-006-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | To Higher Education Analysis Subcommittee |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 305 | 7e-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 8d-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 660 | 5-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 665 | 10-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 670 | 15-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 680 | 25-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 685 | 30-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 690 | 35-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 947 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |