IL HB2377 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Provides for a partial personnel jurisdiction exemption for rehabilitation/mobility instructors and rehabilitation/mobility instructor trainees at the Illinois School for the Visually Impaired. Removes the sunset date for the partial personnel jurisdiction exemption for all positions within the Illinois School for the Deaf and the Illinois School for the Visually Impaired requiring licensure by the State Board of Education. Effective immediately.
Title
PERSONNEL CD-PARTIAL EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0258 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2017 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 415 | 4d | Amended Code | Citation Text |