IL HB2376 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Family Leave Insurance Program Act. Requires the Department of Labor to establish and administer a Family Leave Insurance Program that provides family leave insurance benefits to eligible employees who take unpaid family leave to care for a newborn child, a newly adopted or newly placed foster child, or a family member with a serious health condition. Sets forth eligibility requirements for benefits under the Act including that the employee must (i) establish that he or she has been employed for at least 680 hours in employment during the employee's qualifying year and (ii) document that he or she has provided the employer with written notice of the employee's intention to take family leave. Defines "employer" to mean (a) any person, partnership, corporation, association, or other business entity that employs 50 or more employees for each working day during each of 20 or more calendar workweeks in the year in which the leave is to be taken or in the year immediately preceding the year in which the leave is to be taken; and (b) the State of Illinois and any other unit of local government. Contains provisions concerning disqualification from benefits; premium payments; the amount and duration of benefits; the recovery of erroneous payments; hearings; defaulted premium payments; elective coverage; employment protection; coordination of family leave; defined terms; and other matters. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Family Leave Insurance Account Fund.
Title
FAMILY LEAVE INSURANCE PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted |
2018-04-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2017-06-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-06-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-06-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-04-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |