IL HB2376 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-02 - Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed January 4, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-02 - Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed January 4, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Facilities Closure Act. Provides that, if appropriations have been made for the current fiscal year for the operation of a State facility during the entire fiscal year, then no action may be taken to close the facility, to reduce its capacity to serve the number of residents, youth, or inmates for which the appropriation was made, or to move its location from the county in which the service is provided, unless the action is specifically approved by the same joint resolution of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE FACILITY CLOSURE
Sponsors
Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Marlow Colvin [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] |
Rep. Careen Gordon [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed January 4, 2011 | |
2010-12-02 | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed | |
2010-12-02 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 1, 2010 | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne | |
2010-11-30 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-001-000 | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2010-11-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 30, 2010 | |
2010-11-24 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-11-18 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 11, 2011 | |
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-01-07 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-002-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-029-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-000-001 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Careen M. Gordon |