IL HB2369 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a public school, including a charter school, to provide reasonable accommodations to a lactating pupil on a school campus to express breast milk, breastfeed an infant child, or address other needs related to breastfeeding. Sets forth what reasonable accommodations include. Provides that (i) a lactating pupil on a school campus must be provided a reasonable amount of time to accommodate her need to express breast milk or breastfeed an infant child, (ii) a public school shall provide the reasonable accommodations only if there is at least one lactating pupil on the school campus, (iii) a public school may use an existing facility to meet the requirements, and (iv) a pupil may not incur an academic penalty as a result of her use, during the school day, of the reasonable accommodations and must be provided the opportunity to make up any work missed due to such use. Sets forth a complaint procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-BREASTFEEDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-008-000
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105527A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback