IL HB2369 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Requires the Comptroller to post certain financial reports on its website (rather than delivering them to the legislative leaders and the chairpersons of the appropriation committees). Authorizes the Comptroller to publish interim financial reports, rather than a comprehensive annual financial report, under certain circumstances. Amends the State Finance Act. Authorizes, in any year, the State Comptroller to order transferred and the State Treasurer to transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Education Assistance Fund, or the State Comptroller to order transferred and the State Treasurer to transfer from the Education Assistance Fund to the General Revenue Fund, the amounts required to honor vouchers presented by the State Universities Retirement System, a public institution of higher education, or the State Board of Education. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPTROLLER-RECORDS/FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0240 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2013 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 405 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 405 | 19.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |