IL HB2367 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides for the election (rather than appointment) of the board of trustees of the City Colleges of Chicago beginning with the 2025 consolidated election. Provides that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 trustee districts by the General Assembly for seats on the board of trustees, in addition to one at-large trustee. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-CHICAGO-ELECT BOARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2023-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-06-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 7-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2367&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2367.htm |