IL HB2360 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that no licensee under the Act is permitted to advertise its video gaming operation using physical advertisements outside the video gaming location or on off-premises billboard signs, unless directly and permanently affixed to a building on the video gaming location or on a permanent pole sign that is permanently affixed to a foundation.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-RESTRICT ADS
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Gaming Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Gaming Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Gaming Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |