IL HB2347 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 1. Further amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission shall study and make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the impact and advisability of raising the minimum age of detention to 14, and develop a process to assist in the implementation of the provisions of the amendatory Act. Further amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that probation and court services shall document and share on a monthly basis with the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission each instance where alternatives to detention failed or were lacking, including the basis for detention, the providers who were contacted, and the reason alternatives were rejected, lacking, or denied. Provides that instead of detention, minors under the age of 13 who are in conflict with the law may be held accountable through a petition under the Minors Requiring Authoritative Intervention Article of the Act, or may be held accountable through a community mediation program. Provides that on or after July 1, 2025, with the exception of minors age 12 years or older and charged with first degree murder, aggravated criminal sexual assault, aggravated battery in which a firearm was used in the offense, or aggravated vehicular hijacking, any minor 13 years of age or older arrested pursuant to the Act where there is probable cause to believe that the minor is a delinquent minor and that secure custody is a matter of immediate and urgent necessity in light of a serious threat to the physical safety of a person or persons in the community, or to secure the presence of the minor at the next hearing as evidenced by a demonstrable record of willful failure to appear at a scheduled court hearing within the past 12 months may be kept or detained in an authorized detention facility. Deletes the provisions raising the minimum age from 13 to 14 in which the minor may be committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice.
Title
JUV CT-COMMITMENT-AGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-045-000 |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-04-25 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2023-04-25 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |