IL HB2335 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Biometric Information Privacy Act. Changes the definitions of "biometric identifier" and "written release". Defines "biometric lock", "biometric time clock", "electronic signature", "in writing", and "security purpose". Provides that if the biometric identifier or biometric information is collected or captured for the same repeated process, the private entity is only required to inform the subject or receive consent during the initial collection. Waives certain requirements for collecting, capturing, or otherwise obtaining a person's or a customer's biometric identifier or biometric information under certain circumstances relating to security purposes. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to apply to information captured by a biometric time clock or biometric lock that converts a person's biometric identifier or biometric information to a mathematical representation. Requires the Department of Labor to provide information for employers regarding the requirements of the Act on its website. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that nothing in the Act limits, prevents, or preempts a recovery by an employee under the Biometric Information Privacy Act. Effective immediately.
Title
BIPA-SECURITY PURPOSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability subcommittee |
2023-03-02 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 14 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 14 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 14 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 14 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2335&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2335.htm |