IL HB2332 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that a person who knowingly possesses not more than 0.1 gram of any substance containing cannabis is guilty of a petty offense and shall be fined $100 for a first offense, $200 for a second offense, and $300 for a third or subsequent offense. Provides that a person convicted of a third or subsequent offense shall perform 20 hours of community service at a drug-abuse treatment center licensed by the Department of Human Services. Changes the allocation of fines under the Act. Provides that, in addition to the allocation of fines to units of government that made the seizure of the cannabis, proceeds of fines collected under the Act shall also be used by the Department of Human Services for the funding of programs and services for drug-abuse treatment, prevention and education services for both juveniles and adults. Effective immediately.
Title
CANNABIS-ONE-TENTH GRAM
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Maria Berrios [D] |
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 009-005-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary; 002-001-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 10.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |