IL HB2320 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the 2019 and 2020 levy years, the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law applies to all non-home rule taxing districts. Provides that, for the 2019 and 2020 levy year, the extension limitation under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law is 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTELL-EXTENSION LIMITATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
3520018-185Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-205Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-212Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-213Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-214Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback