IL HB2317 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Provides that except as otherwise provided in the Code, for sport fishing devices or spearing devices, any resident of Illinois who is 16 years of age or older who has not purchased a resident fishing license in the past 10 years shall be eligible to receive a one-time annual resident fishing license for a fee of $5. Provides that any nonresident who has not purchased a nonresident fishing license in the past 10 years shall be eligible to receive a one-time annual sport fishing license for a fee of $10. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
FIRST-TIME FISHING LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0528 |
2023-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 011-000-000 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-04-26 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-11 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |