IL HB2284 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Thyroid Guard Act. Provides that a health care facility that conducts x-ray imaging must have a thyroid guard available and require personnel conducting the x-ray imaging to give a patient the option of using it, unless the thyroid guard would directly interfere with the ability of the personnel to obtain the x-ray imaging that was ordered.
Title
THYROID GUARD ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2284&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2284.htm |