IL HB2270 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-08 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-08 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Winters [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Charles Jefferson [D] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-08 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2011-10-24 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 25, 2011 |
2011-08-12 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000 |
2011-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2011-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Tollway Oversight Committee; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |