IL HB2264 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that a unit of local government shall make the unit's public buildings within the election authority's jurisdiction available as permanent or temporary early voting polling places without charge if the unit of local government determines that the use would neither interfere with the normal operations within the building nor cause the unit of local government to incur additional expenses, including, but not limited to, additional labor costs (currently, the use of the public building is mandatory, without exceptions, upon request of the election authority). Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-USE OF PUBLIC BUILDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 19A-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2264&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2264.htm |