IL HB2199 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the transfer of departmental functions related to diabetes from the Department of Human Services.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Tom Cross [R] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] |
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0097 |
2013-07-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Cross |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2013-04-12 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Durkin |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-642 | Amended Code | Citation Text |