IL HB2159 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Smoke Free Illinois Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Rep. Maurice West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-04-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 82 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |