IL HB2125 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Owned By Noncitizens Act. Provides that, beginning on the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Governor shall take such actions as may be necessary to prohibit the purchase of public or private real estate located in Illinois by any noncitizens. Provides that the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability shall submit to the General Assembly a report that details the history of purchases of public and private real estate located in the State by noncitizens; provides more information on the percentage of real estate located in the State that is owned by noncitizens; and offers recommendations to make it easier for citizens and harder for noncitizens to purchase real estate located in the State, including farmland. Repeals the provisions 5 years after the effective date of the Act. Makes conforming changes.
Title
PROPERTY-FOREIGN NATIONALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 60 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 60 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2125&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2125.htm |