IL HB2100 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. In the statute concerning abuse or criminal neglect of a long term care facility resident, changes references to "an elderly person's or person with a disability's life" to references to "a resident's life". In the statute concerning financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability, provides that a person who violates the provisions is guilty of a Class 1 felony if the elderly person is 70 years of age or older (instead of "over 70 years of age") and the value of the property is $15,000 or more.
Title
CRIM CD-ELDER ABUSE-EXPLOIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0293 |
2023-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-4.4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |