IL HB2071 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning penalties.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 5 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |