IL HB2067 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. In provisions concerning intradivisional transfers at the Department of Corrections, provides that a person committed to a Department of Corrections facility may make a request to be transferred to another facility every 6 months. In provisions concerning intradivisional transfers at the Department of Juvenile Justice, provides that a person committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice, or the committed person's parent or guardian, may make a request to be transferred to another institution or facility of the Department of Juvenile Justice at any time.
Title
DOC&DJJ-TRANSFER REQUEST
Sponsors
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock [D] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000 |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-10-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |