IL HB2056 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change: Restores current law prohibiting an institution of higher learning from requiring an applicant to complete the test of basic skills prior to the semester before student teaching or prior to the semester before starting the final semester of an internship (rather than prior to completing a semester of student teaching or of an internship). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR LICENSE-TEST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-001-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-001-001 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-001-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-06 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |