IL HB2054 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Creates the offense of copper theft. Provides that a person commits copper theft when, without the consent of the owner, he or she knowingly obtains or exerts control over property of the owner or aids or assists in obtaining or exerting control over property of the owner consisting of any copper or copper alloy that is manufactured, sold, or used for certain specified purposes. Provides that copper theft is a Class 4 felony for a first offense and a Class 3 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
CRIM CD-CREATES COPPER THEFT
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] |
Sen. John Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Held in Criminal Law; Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000 |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
2011-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis |