IL HB2028 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-12)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-12)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall pay directly or reimburse, up to a maximum of $20,000 (rather than $10,000) the burial expenses of each State police officer who is killed in the line of duty after June 30, 2018. Amends the Line of Duty Compensation Act. Provides that a burial benefit of up to a maximum of $20,000 (rather than $10,000) shall be payable to the surviving spouse or estate of a law enforcement officer or fireman who is killed in the line of duty after June 30, 2018.
Title
ST POLICE-BURIAL REIMBURSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0028 |
2019-06-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-06-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 12.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |