IL HB1929 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State, at the option of the applicant, shall issue permanent registration plates for a one-time fee of $118 to the owner of a trailer having a gross weight of 3,000 pounds or less. Provides that a person who has been issued a permanent trailer plate is not required to pay the annual flat weight tax and registration fee. Lowers the annual flat weight tax and registration fee for trailers with a gross weight of 3,000 pounds or less from $118 to $18.
Title
VEH CD-PERMANENT TRAILER PLATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-808.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-819 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1929&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1929.htm |