IL HB1925 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compensation Review Act. Provides that members of the General Assembly are prohibited from receiving and shall not receive any increase in compensation that would otherwise apply based on a cost of living adjustment for terms commencing on or after July 1, 2021, unless otherwise approved by law. Effective immediately.
Title
GA-COLA PROHIBITED
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1925&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1925.htm |