IL HB1899 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Paint Stewardship Act. Contains the findings of the General Assembly. Provides that manufacturers of architectural paint sold at retail in the State or representative organizations shall submit to the Director of the Environmental Protection Agency a plan for the establishment of a postconsumer paint stewardship program. Requires the program to meet specified requirements. Provides that manufacturers or retailers shall not sell or offer for sale architectural paint to any person in the State unless the manufacturer of a paint brand or representative organization is implementing an approved paint stewardship plan. Prohibits the incineration of leftover architectural paint collected pursuant to an approved paint stewardship plan. Provides that manufacturers or representative organizations shall submit reports with specified requirements. Provides that manufacturers or representative organizations participating in a postconsumer paint stewardship program shall not be liable for any claim of a violation of antitrust, restraint of trade, unfair trade practice, or other anticompetitive conduct arising from conduct undertaken in accordance with the program. Provides administrative and oversight fees to be paid to the Agency. Provides that manufacturers or representative organizations shall implement the postconsumer paint collection plan within 6 months of the date that the program plan is approved. Contains provisions regarding postconsumer paint from households and small businesses. Contains other provisions.
Title
PAINT STEWARDSHIP-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |