IL HB1883 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of the Department of Natural Resources to deliver a quitclaim deed for a portion of real property in Peoria County to the Village of Dunlap for $1, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR-LAND TRANSFER-DUNLAP
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |