IL HB1879 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-03-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |