IL HB1877 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the exemption from registration with the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation for a veterinary clinic or hospital operated by a State-supported or publicly funded university or college shall not operate to bar the University of Illinois from requesting, nor the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation from issuing, a registration to the University of Illinois Veterinary Teaching Hospital under the Act. Provides that neither a request for such registration nor the issuance of such registration to the University of Illinois shall operate to otherwise waive or modify the exemption. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-UI VET TEACHING
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Rep. Angelo Saviano [R] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Shane Cultra [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0126 |
2011-07-14 | House | Effective Date July 14, 2011 |
2011-07-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2011 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-03-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jason Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |