IL HB1876 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the "Medicaid" Article.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0236 |
2015-08-03 | House | Effective Date August 3, 2015 |
2015-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-009-002 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-003-000 |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-004-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
2015-04-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David R. Leitch |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |