IL HB1871 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that in distribution of the remaining funds received under the federal Help America Vote Act, the State Board of Elections may make such funds available to election authorities for the maintenance of secure collection sites for the return of vote by mail ballots. Allows election authorities to establish curb-side voting for individuals to cast a ballot during early voting or on election day. Provides that an election authority's curb-side voting program shall designate at least 2 election judges from opposite parties per vehicle and the individual must have the option to mark the ballot without interference from the election judges. Requires election authorities to accept any vote by mail ballot returned, including ballots returned with insufficient or no postage. Allows election authorities to establish secure collection sites for postage-free return of vote by mail ballots. Provides for the collection and processing of vote by mail ballots submitted to collection sites. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall establish additional guidelines for the security of collection sites. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECT CODE-VOTE BY MAIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0001 |
2021-04-02 | House | Effective Date April 2, 2021 |
2021-04-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-04-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-007-001 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-005-001 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2021 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 070-041-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Ethics & Elections Committee; 010-007-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 17-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 19-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |